The Recovery Course

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Recovery Course supports all Christ based Recovery Courses by creating community, sharing resources, expertise and offering training and support material for existing Recovery Courses and groups wishing to start offering Recovery Courses within their own communities. Specific activities are running Recovery Courses, and equipping/supporting others running courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 December 2016: Standard registration
- RECOVERYTWO (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard York | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Skelsey | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joanna Mary Davies | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Page | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Marcus Wells | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Skelsey | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert George Street BA | Trustee | 29 July 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.82k | £24.47k | £41.38k | £6.81k | £17.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.72k | £28.52k | £27.90k | £11.96k | £22.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 17 JUN 2019 as amended on 11 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
6. THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ("THE OBJECT") WHICH IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THE ISSUE OF ADDICTION AND THE PROVISION OF RECOVERY AND SUPPORT SERVICES TO THOSE AFFECTED BY ADDICTION. NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Tonbridge Baptist Church
Derwent Road
TONBRIDGE
Kent
TN10 3HZ
- Phone:
- 07584063310
- Email:
- gavin@therecoverycourse.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window