Trustees THE PILMUIR ESTATE
Charity number: 1167275

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOHN RICHARD EDMUND WHITEHEAD | Chair | 07 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Ashley Bevans | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr Rachel Claire Varnam | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Hugh Meek | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER HAROLD RUMBELOW | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN DAVID KING | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.