COMMUNITY CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE LONGSIGHT

Charity number: 1166806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A Christian Church who share a common hope ? to follow Jesus & live everyday, ordinary lives in the light of the resurrection, here & now. We are hopeful for the present & future transformation of our lives & the communities we live in:children's/youth activities; drop-in sessions; food bank collections; night shelter; prayer groups & Bible studies; community events/activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £81,488
Total expenditure: £90,468

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 April 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • MANCHESTER 1ST CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Suzannah Claire Sammons Trustee 05 February 2023
THE BOAZ TRUST
Received: On time
Boaz Trust
Recently registered
Rev Lynn Birkinshaw Trustee 02 June 2022
THE CROSSROADS CENTRE
Charity reporting is overdue by 289 days
Dr Iain Angus George Maciver Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
DR PETER RAE Trustee 11 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £76.82k £105.13k £72.84k £68.08k £81.49k
Total expenditure £71.98k £88.49k £87.04k £68.42k £90.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 30 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 25 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 25 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 04 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 04 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 12 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 27 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Community Church of the Nazarene
Toll Gate Close
MANCHESTER
M13 0LG
Phone:
01614456328