SMD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting education, relieving poverty and advancing the Orthodox Jewish religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bury
- Salford City
Governance
- 30 June 2016: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID SALZMAN | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|||||||||
SIMON SALZMAN | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
MARTINE CAMILLE HUPPERT | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £195.82k | £120.86k | £235.07k | £243.93k | £412.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.40k | £97.73k | £97.93k | £139.35k | £100.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 NOV 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AROUND THE WORLD IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS; OR BY GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANIZATIONS WORLDWIDE THAT PROVIDE EDUCATION; THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING: GRANTS OR LOANS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANIZATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; AND TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION WORLDWIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CODE OF JEWISH LAW (SHULCHAN ARUCH).
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 Windsor Road
Prestwich
MANCHESTER
M25 0DB
- Phone:
- 01617401234
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window