Financial history BOLTON ABBEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 507743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £18.43k £30.96k £15.79k £18.58k £15.13k
Total expenditure £13.05k £13.43k £19.08k £14.31k £22.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.64k N/A N/A N/A