THE DIRECTORS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports directors in need and inspires young people from all backgrounds to consider careers as directors. The Directors Support Scheme provides emergency short-term financial help to directors in need. The Get Directing! project mentors young people and teachers in and outside of the school environment. The Mental Health and Wellbeing service offers support, events and online resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 August 2016: CIO registration
- DCF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Chowns | Chair | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ben Matthew Vivien Woodiwiss | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Guy Michael Gibbons | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Dower | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Daniel Richard Zeff | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Paige | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS ROBERTS | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY GOSTYN | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.26k | £104.48k | £56.51k | £53.18k | £61.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.25k | £103.66k | £84.81k | £50.46k | £60.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 October 2022 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 October 2022 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Aug 2016 as amended on 02 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS PARTICULARLY THOSE PRACTISED BY AND RESULTING FROM THE ACTIVITIES OF DIRECTORS AND OTHER PERSONS WITH SIMILAR RESPONSIBILITIES HAVING CREATIVE CHARGE OF UNITS OR SUB-UNITS OF PRODUCTION IN EVERY ACTIVITY INVOLVING THE CREATIVE PROCESS OR ARTISTIC ENDEAVOUR; 3.2 TO PROMOTE ANY RELATED CHARITABLE PURPOSE INCLUDING THE ARRANGEMENT AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF CO-OPERATION WITH AND BETWEEN PUBLIC AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL ORGANISATIONS WITH SIMILAR OBJECTS OR OBJECTS AFFECTING DIRECTORS; 3.3 TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONG THOSE ENGAGED IN THE ARTS AND PARTICULARLY AMONG DIRECTORS THEIR DEPENDANTS AND RELATIVES; 3.4 AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE:- 3.4.1 TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH AND TO PRINT PUBLICISE ISSUE AND OTHERWISE DISSEMINATE ANY USEFUL PRODUCTS THEREOF IN ANY LITERARY AURAL OR VISUAL FORM AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE ACQUISITION STORAGE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATIVE AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL IN ANY FORM RELEVANT TO THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO; AND 3.4.2 TO PRESENT PROMOTE ORGANISE PROVIDE MANAGE AND PRODUCE ANY LITERARY AURAL OR VISUAL MATERIAL WHICH MAY ADVANCE THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO PURCHASE ACQUIRE OBTAIN INTERESTS IN AND DEAL WITH COPYRIGHT AND OTHER RIGHTS IN ANY SUCH MATERIAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 4th Floor
22 Stukeley Street
London
WC2B 5LR
- Phone:
- 02072400009
- Email:
- admin@directorscf.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window