Financial history DANESIDE COMMUNITY THEATRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 507772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £91.65k £27.42k £85.24k £216.97k £313.29k
Total expenditure £75.11k £45.04k £62.53k £102.33k £254.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £20.87k £4.67k N/A N/A