NORTHOP HALL GIRLS FC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Northop Hall Girls FC is a grassroots football club operating in the Flintshire area. It is an all girls football club and is the largest in North Wales. The teams enter into the North Wales Girls Football League
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Flintshire
Governance
- 25 April 2016: CIO registration
- Northop Hall Girls & Ladies FC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Brian Joseph Albiston | Chair | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Jane Gerrard | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN FAGAN | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Colin Edward Pugh | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.44k | £9.85k | £22.09k | £26.48k | £44.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.21k | £5.13k | £31.29k | £26.27k | £40.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £7.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 May 2023 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 May 2023 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 February 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 February 2021 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF WOMEN AND GIRLS IN THE COUNTY OF FLINTSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES IN NORTH WALES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE: • LEAGUES, CUP COMPETITIONS AND OTHER FIXTURES; • ACTIVITIES TO RAISE STANDARDS OF PLAYING, COACHING AND REFEREEING IN FEMALE FOOTBALL; AND • ACTIVITIES TO INCREASE PARTICIPATION AND FACILITATE ACCESS TO THE SPORT TO ALL FEMALES WITHIN THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ty Brith
Llandegla Road
Llanarmon-yn-Ial
Mold
CH7 4QX
- Phone:
- 01824780937
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window