NORTHUMBRIA BLOOD BIKES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Out of hours courier service to local NHS trusts provided by volunteers free of charge
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
220 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 22 April 2016: CIO registration
- 25 November 2021: Funds received from 509219 THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF FREEMAN HOSPITAL
- NBB (Working name)
- NORTHUMBRIA BLOODBIKES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Curran | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Whitmore | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mann | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Smith | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Burnett | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Redpath | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jason Cooper | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
SEAN STOREY | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTY LAWRENCE | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.61k | £123.62k | £134.09k | £134.09k | £172.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.82k | £141.43k | £150.85k | £150.85k | £161.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 22 Apr 2016 as amended on 28 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
To advance health and save lives, primarily in Northumberland, Newcastle, Gateshead, South Tyneside, North Tyneside and Co Durham & Darlington, by providing a volunteer courier service ancillary to transport provided by the statutory authorities for the transfer of blood, blood products and other medical resources between hospitals and medical facilities
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northumbria Blood Bikes
Northumbria House
Abbey Road
Pity Me
Durham
DH1 5FJ
- Phone:
- 0191 364 3113
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window