BESPACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BeSpace advances the Christian faith for the public benefit by running prayer spaces, engaging members of the community in prayer spaces and training christians to provide these spaces for their local communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
600 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Revd Canon Dr Geoffrey Brian Tudor Bayliss | Chair | 20 July 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Gemma Louise Beesley | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Nina Kristin Oskarsdottir | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Mary Krutz | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Patrick Nigel Christopher Gale Mr | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.84k | £59.71k | £41.61k | £30.39k | £34.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.46k | £31.97k | £29.10k | £38.93k | £41.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO, CREATING PRAYER SPACES TO ENGAGE WITH MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY, DEVELOPING EDUCATION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SCHOOLS AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. James Church Centre
13 Beauchamp Lane
OXFORD
OX4 3LF
- Phone:
- 01865 208200
- Email:
- info@bespace.be
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window