TAVISTOCK METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Christian faith in the local area by supporting and encouraging the work of the individual Methodist Churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

21 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 29 July 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAMELA JANE WYLIE | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Deborah Bevan | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffery Ian Parsons | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Gerald Dingle | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Dodd | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Alan Palmer | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Alison Louise Mansfield Ali | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Tamblin | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SMITH | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christine Hunt | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PRIMROSE MARY SKEDGELL | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Jane Wright | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|||||
JANE PEGGY MARY BALL | Trustee | 24 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE GRACE TAMBLIN | Trustee | 01 October 2010 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM JOHN SHILLABEER | Trustee | 13 March 2008 |
|
|||||
Hilary Ann Boot-Handford | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|||||
DR DAVID HUGH BENZIE | Trustee | 01 October 2004 |
|
|||||
DAVID EDWARD DODD | Trustee | 01 April 2002 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JOAN GOSLING | Trustee | 01 October 2000 |
|
|||||
Rev JEFFREY CHARLES MOLES | Trustee | 01 September 2000 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE WENDY PALMER | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.14k | £121.04k | £133.26k | £735.69k | £160.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.23k | £153.15k | £162.06k | £151.58k | £773.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £124.21k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £563.23k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.99k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £45.25k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £60.67k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £80.02k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.89k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF: (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; METHODIST CHURCH ACT 1976 (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION BEING A SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH: (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Methodist Church
Chapel Street
TAVISTOCK
PL19 8DX
- Phone:
- 01822611049
- Email:
- info@tmc.me.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window