Trustees THE WELSH SCHOOLS TRUST LIMITED
Charity Number: 1167479

Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Edwards | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Myers | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Wiliiams | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gwendoline Jane Jones | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lynne Sykes | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
GLENYS ROBERTS | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
CEREDIG THOMAS | Trustee | 16 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.