BRITISH SKI AND SNOWBOARD NATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The British Ski and Snowboard National Foundation invests in the future of British snowsports. We support projects which give young people opportunities to get involved in skiing and snowboarding, as well as giving grants to young athletes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 May 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR JOHN RITBLAT | Chair | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GEORGE COHEN | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS RORY TAPNER | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.18k | £121.28k | £185.46k | £42.08k | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.56k | £136.07k | £230.61k | £51.79k | £18.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 09 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES OR OPPORTUNITIES FOR PARTICIPATING IN SKIING, SNOWBOARDING AND OTHER SNOW SPORTS ("FACILITIES" MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING EVENTS); TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCE OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The British Olympic Association
101 New Cavendish Street
LONDON
W1W 6XH
- Phone:
- 02078425700
- Email:
- bssnf@bssnf.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window