Trustees ST BARTHOLOMEW'S HERITAGE
Charity number: 1167316
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC GEORGE REYNOLDS | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Anthony John Hales | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Dr Rupert William Evenett | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Doug Harmer | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Clare Maurice | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Amicia De Moubray | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Dr Robert Treharne Jones | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Christopher Mark Pemberton | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Dr CHARLES KNIGHT | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.