SPOONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the charity are to relieve the needs of parents and families of babies who experience neonatal care in Greater Manchester by the provision of support and information, and to advance awareness and education of neonatal care, and its implications for families, to health professionals and the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 11 May 2016: CIO registration
- 05 July 2023: Funds received from 1149354 SHORT BOWEL SURVIVOR AND FRIENDS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Rawlinson | Chair | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Adams | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Lowe | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Royle | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Khadijah Salim | Trustee | 18 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Ashscroft | Trustee | 12 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.13k | £170.98k | £281.99k | £103.47k | £272.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.71k | £136.16k | £252.38k | £202.25k | £175.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.05k | N/A | N/A | £500 | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 03 March 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 11 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED ON 16 DEC 2021 AMENDED ON 10 JAN 2022 as amended on 11 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
The objects are, for the public benefit, 1) to improve the mental health and relieve the needs of parents and families of babies who experience neonatal care in Greater Manchester through the provision of emotional support, information and guidance, therapeutic services, community support and counselling; 2) to advance education by promoting awareness of neonatal care, and its implications for families, to health professionals and the general public.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spoons
Albany Mill
Old Hall Street
Middleton
MANCHESTER
M24 1AG
- Phone:
- 03003650363
- Email:
- care@spoons.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window