MERIDEN ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aims and objectives: ?To provide, maintain and develop facilities at Meriden Adventure Playground for children, young people and families resident in Chelmsley Wood and its? surrounding areas, through the provision of safe and stimulating play opportunities so as to develop their physical, social and mental skills.?
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £61,786 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Solihull
Governance
- 27 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Wood | Chair | 12 October 2016 |
|
|||||||
Jeanette Burrows | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Marcus Brain | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
David Anthony Wood | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Wilson | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Mccallmont Clarke | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN LOUIS FREEMAN | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/04/2020 | 03/04/2021 | 03/04/2022 | 03/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.54k | £246.08k | £394.61k | £316.03k | £346.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.46k | £144.79k | £280.38k | £353.19k | £350.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £54.04k | £61.79k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 April 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 April 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Jan 2017 as amended on 17 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE, MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE FACILITIES AT MERIDEN ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND FOR CHILDREN RESIDENT IN CHELMSLEY WOOD AND SMITHS WOOD, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SAFE AND STIMULATING PLAY OPPORTUNITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, SOCIAL AND MENTAL SKILLS.
Area of benefit
IN CHELMSLEY WOOD AND SMITHS WOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Meriden Adventure Playground
Moorend Avenue
Chelmsley Wood
BIRMINGHAM
B37 5TE
- Phone:
- 07912674136
- Website:
-
meridenadventureplayground.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window