UKLFI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity advances legal education into the causes and effects of anti-semitism in particular anti-semitism which manifests itself with regard to the State of Israel and promotes racial harmony for the public benefit by the elimination of such anti-semitism, by providing legal support, advice advocacy and assistance to the victims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Efrat Sopher | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Albert George Nelson Levy | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marc Andre Lorin Polonsky | Trustee | 10 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Susan Rebecca Storring | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Victor Melkman | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Harvey John Rose | Trustee | 05 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.04k | £54.52k | £70.61k | £105.28k | £228.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.72k | £58.05k | £42.37k | £87.82k | £105.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE LEGAL EDUCATION IN NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL POLITICAL, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POLICY REGARDING (I) THE STATE OF ISRAEL AND (II) THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF, PARTICULARLY ANTI-SEMITISM WHICH MANIFESTS ITSELF WITH REGARD TO THE STATE OF ISRAEL, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, THROUGH (A) ORGANISING LEGAL TRAINING (B) THE STAGING OF LEGAL LECTURES AND (C) THE PROMOTION OF LEGAL RESEARCH AND THE PUBLICATION OF ITS USEFUL RESULTS. 2. TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ELIMINATION OF ANTI-SEMITISM (PARTICULARLY ANTI-SEMITISM WHICH MANIFESTS ITSELF WITH REGARD TO THE STATE OF ISRAEL) BY (I) PROVIDING LEGAL SUPPORT TO VICTIMS OF ANTI-SEMITISM (II) HELPING SUCH VICTIMS BY PROVIDING ADVICE, ADVOCACY, CARE, RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE AND (III) FOSTER RELATIONS AMONG LAWYERS FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING SUCH LEGAL SUPPORT AND HELP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gravita Registered Office
PO Box 81142
LONDON
E1W 9US
- Phone:
- 020 7330 0000
- Email:
- office@uklficharity.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window