LOSTOCK (25TH BOLTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Based at St. Thomas & St. John in Lostock Bolton, Beavers (6-8 years), Cubs (8 to 10 years) Scouts (10 to 14 years) The 25th Bolton Scouts Group is dedicated to helping young people to make the most of life by taking part in the many activities organised by the leaders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Bolton
Governance
- 03 October 1978: Standard registration
- LOSTOCK SCOUTS AND GUIDES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Dean | Chair | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Taylor | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Nash | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN ANDREW FLETCHER | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Butterworth | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Dawson | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Cornwell | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Nicholls | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Pryar | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|||||
NEIL HIGGINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.61k | £15.77k | £13.63k | £18.03k | £18.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.38k | £16.68k | £11.71k | £22.06k | £18.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £130 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE,LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP
Area of benefit
LOSTOCK, BOLTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 MARTINSCLOUGH
LOSTOCK
BOLTON
BL6 4PF
- Phone:
- 07720 716222
- Email:
- vicky.dean@25thbolton.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window