THE PALMIRO FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees raise funds, hold the trust fund generated and the income it generates on trust with the intention that both may be applied in the pursuit of lawful charitable purposes, at their absolute discretion. They have expressed themselves particularly interested in the areas of education and training, the prevention or relief of poverty and the promotion of arts, culture, heritage and science
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 June 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN STEPHEN ECKERSLEY | Chair | 22 June 2016 |
|
|||||
DAVID ELTON | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JANE ECKERSLEY | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5 | £5 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £6.07k | £96 | £72 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS IS TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10
Ashfield Lodge
Palatine Road
Manchester
- Phone:
- 01612334891
- Email:
- contact@palmiro.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window