HOSPICE HOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bright Hope offers a range of non-clinical, therapeutic and social care services in North West Leicestershire. The charity supports adults who have a life limiting condition, or one that leads to a significant reduction in quality of life, as well as offering support to their partner, carer or family.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £33,900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
47 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 10 October 2016: CIO registration
- 14 April 2025: Funds received from 1166173 IBSTOCK COMMUNITY LIBRARY
- Bright Hope in North West Leicestershire (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Holdcroft | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angus Bennion | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Delyth Perry | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA RILEY | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Gillian Hoult | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lesley Notghi | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER LAST | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROY ALAN STOBBS | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janette Shepherd | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.74k | £172.38k | £115.41k | £189.79k | £180.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.31k | £118.98k | £156.07k | £188.92k | £225.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £33.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AMONGST PERSONS WITH LIFE LIMITING ILLNESS AND THEIR CARERS IN NORTH WEST LEICESTERSHIRE: A) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SUPPORT SERVICES B) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE C) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FUNDS TO SUPPORT SUCH INDIVIDUALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bright Hope House
Talbot Lane
Swannington
Leicestershire
LE67 8QT
- Phone:
- 01530 648 553
- Email:
- info@brighthope-nwl.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window