OCEAN EDGE CHARITY GROUP

Charity number: 1168001
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising Money with the help of other owners, for various charities on Ocean Edge Leisure Park

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 July 2016: Standard registration
  • 20 January 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 20 January 2025: Funds transferred to 225971 BRITISH HEART FOUNDATION
  • 20 January 2025: Funds transferred to 295672 MAKE-A-WISH FOUNDATION UK
  • 20 January 2025: Funds transferred to 1089464 CANCER RESEARCH UK
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.84k £984 £1 £0 £0
Total expenditure £907 £258 £1 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window