KING'S LYNN DEBT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
King's Lynn Debt Centre (KLDC) exists to relieve individuals and families from financial debt. KLDC is run by three partner churches and it works in liaison with Christians Against Poverty. Income for the operation of KLDC is raised via individuals, the partner churches, fundraising activities and grant aid. KLDC is non-profit making. The Centre Manager is contracted to work 20 hours per week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 17 June 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Osborne | Chair | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julian Hallett | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Walmsley | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Walmsley | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Johnson | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Mallet | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chester Noble | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Currey | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.86k | £19.40k | £30.90k | £23.81k | £21.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.25k | £24.17k | £22.90k | £18.39k | £16.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 December 2020 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 December 2020 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR PERSONS LIVING IN AND AROUND NORTH WEST NORFOLK WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC LIVING IN AND AROUND NORTH WEST NORFOLK IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE MANAGEMENT OF THEIR PERSONAL FINANCES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH CARE, COMPASSION AND RELEVANT PRACTICAL AND SPIRITUAL HELP AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Kings Centre
Wellesley Street
Kings Lynn
Norfolk
PE30 1QD
- Phone:
- 01553 766333
- Email:
- rachel-osborne@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window