MEMORIAL TO THE OFFICERS AND MEN OF THE SHERWOOD FORESTERS (NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND DERBYSHIRE REGIMENT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees are responsible for ensuring that the Regimental Memorial and the grounds are used only for the purpose in which they were given. They have no financial responsibility, as that lies with the Trustees of The Mercian Regiment. The Trustees have approved the resurfacing of the footpath to the Tower with an anti-slip material.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Staffordshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 22 January 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Cullen | Chair | 23 October 2014 |
|
|||||
Lieutenant Colonel Keith Seddon MBE BEM | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Fothergill CBE | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Paul Gilby | Trustee | 17 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant General Ian Cave CB | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant Colonel Richard Spiby | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Major Bob Prophet | Trustee | 23 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brig Peter Dennis CBE | Trustee | 26 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Sir John Wilfred Peace | Trustee | 25 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Simon Banton OBE | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Col David Sneath MA TD DL | Trustee |
|
||||||
Brigadier Edward Wilkinson | Trustee |
|
||||||
Major Harry John Cockburn Loveday TD BA DL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lieutenant Colonel Nick Turner | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 28 FEBRUARY 1924 AND DEED OF GIFT DATED 8 JULY 1941.
Charitable objects
A MEMORIAL TOWER TO THE OFFICERS AND MEN OF THE SHERWOODFORESTERS (NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND DERBYSHIRE REIGMENT WHO FELL IN THE GREAT WAR. SUCH TOWER TO BE OPEN TO THE PUBLIC ON SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AND AT SUCH TIMES AS THE SHERWOOD FORESTERS OLD COMRADES ASSOCIATION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME PRESCRIBE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
RHQ MERCIAN
Whittington Barracks
Lichfield
WS14 9TJ
- Phone:
- 01543434359
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window