DUNMOW U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide benefit to retired and semi-retired persons by way of regular monthly meetings with speakers, and group activities according to members' interests.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 20 July 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL CHARLES BEST | Chair | 21 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Hilary Jinno | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Best | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Heather Quiney | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Robert Marshall | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Michael Jones | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNA ELIZABETH FLETCHER | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Joy Jensen | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Terence Leslie Parker BSc hons | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN WATSON BSC | Trustee | 17 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.60k | £13.50k | £35.67k | £40.41k | £49.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.90k | £12.13k | £30.10k | £36.39k | £44.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 AUG 2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 25 SEP 2019 AS AMENDED ON 29 JUL 2020 AS AMENDED ON 30 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
cottage
The Downs
Dunmow
CM6 1DS
- Phone:
- 07946652222
- Email:
- AEFLETCHERU3A@OUTLOOK.COM
- Website:
-
dunmow.u3asite.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window