MEDICINE FOR THE WORLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity obtain donations of original, unused, in-date medical supplies from the UK which would otherwise be wasted and send them to hospitals and clinics in resource poor locations which have specific needs for them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ethiopia
- Malawi
- Nepal
Governance
- 04 July 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID LEVIN MA MBA | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr NICOLA ABIGAIL ROSENFELDER | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £300 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £457 | £475 | £0 | £300 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH BY ORGANISING THE REDISTRIBUTION OF MEDICINES OR MEDICAL GOODS WHICH WOULD OTHERWISE BE WASTED OR DESTROYED IN THE UK OR OTHER COUNTRIES AND TO ARRANGE THEIR TRANSFER TO HOSPITALS AND CLINICS IN LESS DEVELOPED COUNTRIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED CHARITABLE WORKS
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 New Cavendish Street
1st Floor South
London
W1W 6XH
- Phone:
- 02074676300
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window