Financial history ARMED FORCES EDUCATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1167682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £403.27k £410.06k £425.54k £478.80k £523.84k
Total expenditure £397.79k £291.16k £486.38k £141.43k £965.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £313
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £520.93k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.60k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £965.25k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £710.71k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0