Financial history SATMAR KOLEL

Charity number: 1169555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £734.30k £764.44k £812.76k £841.28k £380.84k
Total expenditure £722.83k £800.78k £774.62k £1.03m £318.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £734.30k £764.44k £812.76k £841.28k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £722.83k £797.03k £769.77k £1.01m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £3.75k £4.85k £11.68k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £1.70k £2.49k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £721.13k £794.54k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £500 N/A