Financial history CAM ESTATES

Charity number: 1167993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.40m £165.06k £168.45k £220.63k £178.22k
Total expenditure £908.88k £207.39k £167.95k £221.14k £189.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.22m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £179.27k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £869.98k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £38.91k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.80k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £859.29k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £38.91k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A