CHESTER BACH SINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chester Bach Singers performs a series of concerts annually and hosts Choral Workshops and Come & Sing events. Through these activities we educate and inform the public. We also work with schools and colleges, offering a Young Singers Scheme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 08 August 2016: CIO registration
- 04 June 2018: Funds received from 1018974 CHESTER BACH SINGERS
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Mai Crich | Chair | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Parsley | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Nalda Rooney | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Curran | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA BROOKS | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.70k | £20.19k | £4.90k | £13.13k | £20.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.32k | £19.59k | £4.50k | £13.77k | £26.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 08 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE MAINTAIN AND ADVANCE MUSICAL EDUCATION BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE SUCH OBJECTS INCLUDE BUT ARE NOT LIMITED TO THE FOLLOWING UPHOLDING A STANDARD OF EXCELLENCE IN CHORAL PERFORMANCE PERFORMING AND PROMOTING A WIDE AND CHALLENGING REPERTOIRE INCLUDING THE WORKS OF JS BACH RAISING MUSICAL STANDARDS AND FURTHERING THE APPRECIATION OF MUSICAL ART IN THE NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND NURTURING SINGING SKILLS AMONGST YOUNGER PEOPLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Penlan Drive
Hawarden
Flintshire
CH5 3HP
- Phone:
- 01244538586
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window