THE CLWYD-POWYS ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST

Charity Number: 508301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust is one of the four archaeological trusts in Wales which work closely with other national, regional and local bodies and members of the general public to help record, interpret and protect all aspects of the historic environment

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 January 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE CLWYD-POWYS ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Judith Wainwright Trustee 31 March 2024
THE TRUST FOR WELSH ARCHAEOLOGY
Received: On time
GWYNEDD ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Dr CAROL BELL Trustee 31 March 2024
WELSH SINGERS SHOWCASE
Received: On time
THE CYFARTHFA FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF LONDON
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
THE INSTITUTE FOR ARCHAEO-METALLURGICAL STUDIES
Received: On time
John Baron Ratcliffe Trustee 31 March 2024
GWYNEDD ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
THE TRUST FOR WELSH ARCHAEOLOGY
Received: On time
Nigel David Clubb Trustee 31 March 2024
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF BRECON CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
THE TRUST FOR WELSH ARCHAEOLOGY
Received: On time
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF BRECON CATHEDRAL DEON A CHABIDWL CADEIRLAN ABERHONDDU
Recently registered
David Elis-Williams Trustee 31 March 2024
THE TRUST FOR WELSH ARCHAEOLOGY
Received: On time
Henry Stuart Owen-John Trustee 31 March 2024
THE TRUST FOR WELSH ARCHAEOLOGY
Received: On time
WORLD HERITAGE UK
Received: On time
GWYNEDD ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Steffan Rhys Williams Trustee 31 March 2024
THE TRUST FOR WELSH ARCHAEOLOGY
Received: On time
GWYNEDD ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Hywel Rhys Richard John Trustee 31 March 2024
GWYNEDD ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
FIONA GALE Trustee 20 October 2018
CAMBRIAN ARCHAEOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Dr SIAN ELUNED REES Trustee 02 November 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £606.53k £652.41k £658.52k £707.22k £1.19m
Total expenditure £586.68k £574.21k £564.29k £657.29k £1.80m
Income from government contracts £85.85k £42.57k £57.30k £116.67k £110.37k
Income from government grants £331.65k £433.50k £333.88k £474.85k £402.48k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £317.24k £474.85k £400.95k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £341.13k £231.91k £0
Income - Charitable activities £604.61k £652.10k £0 £0 £452.32k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.92k £315 £154 £465 £23.10k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £460
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £586.68k £574.21k £564.29k £657.29k £865.64k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £12.95k £11.55k £17.36k £49.32k £78.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £934.77k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £58.18k £62.66k £54.92k £46.42k £0
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £578.17k £658.46k £716.58k £628.32k £0
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£277.84k -£270.79k -£600.00k £0 £0
Total liabilities £71.09k £84.71k £58.85k £69.16k £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 April 2024 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 April 2024 82 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Trust for Welsh Archaeology
6 Carmarthen Street
LLANDEILO
Dyfed
SA19 6AE
Phone:
01938553670