Financial history THE FELLOWSHIP OF INDEPENDENT EVANGELICAL CHURCHES

Charity Number: 1168037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.41m £1.73m £1.27m £2.18m £1.88m
Total expenditure £2.23m £1.03m £1.33m £2.58m £1.91m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.14m £1.69m £1.21m £1.92m £1.59m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £192.21k £4.43k £50.90k £234.41k £255.19k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.38k £11.62k £7.84k £20.85k £35.13k
Income - Other £63.04k £14.81k £1.65k £915 £393
Income - Legacies £167.95k £15.58k £24.81k £161.78k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.23m £1.03m £1.33m £2.58m £1.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.90k £8.51k £10.99k £18.10k £22.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £60 £125.67k £0 £1.22m £340.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £982