Financial history THE 4 BETTER FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1168858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 18/07/2020 18/07/2021 18/07/2022 18/07/2023 18/07/2024
Total gross income £29.35k £66.56k £22.49k £20.42k £30.17k
Total expenditure £10.86k £73.35k £36.13k £39.37k £38.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A