SECURITYWOMEN

Charity number: 1169486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

SecurityWomen operates on an educational basis and promotes awareness of gender equality in the security sector through gathering of data and research, and publicising through our website (www.securitywomen.org), app and social media and through other media events and platforms.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £28
Total expenditure: £4,194

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Rwanda
  • South Africa
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 October 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BARBARA CLEARY Chair 30 July 2018
None on record
Dr Mary-Claire Travers Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Edward Humpherson Trustee 04 December 2024
PRO BONO ECONOMICS
Received: On time
Suzanne Concannon Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Rachel Grimes MBE Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Kurt Eyre Trustee 11 September 2020
None on record
JAMES STANLEY GEER Trustee 02 July 2016
None on record
TERRI MCNERNEY Trustee 02 July 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £20.72k £3.41k £30 £12 £28
Total expenditure £16.09k £5.65k £1.34k £1.13k £4.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.41k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
70 LEXINGTON APARTMENTS
40 CITY ROAD
LONDON
EC1Y 2AN
Phone:
07710245445