Financial history SAMARITANS OF YEOVIL SHERBORNE & DISTRICT

Charity number: 1168371
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £58.31k £39.68k £28.20k £20.25k £19.82k
Total expenditure £733.76k £242.49k £199.75k £50.70k £146.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A