Financial history NORTH WALES SHEEPDOG SOCIETY

Charity number: 508432
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £6.44k £6.13k £16.44k £5.31k £8.96k
Total expenditure £6.26k £4.10k £13.42k £6.51k £6.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A