Financial history MYDDLE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 508439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £13.32k £5.28k £11.85k £7.13k £8.45k
Total expenditure £4.95k £7.14k £5.58k £10.51k £14.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.00k N/A £2.00k N/A N/A