MANCHESTER CITY OF SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to spread the City of Sanctuary network to Manchester making it a welcoming city, open and fair for all. We want to create a more inclusive and welcoming city to those seeking sanctuary who bring skills, enterprise, music, food and hard work to enrich our city. We run monthly conversation clubs and meals as well as offering practical projects and signposting services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 19 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sami Gichki | Chair | 15 May 2024 |
|
|||||||
Naveeda Ikram | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|||||||
Helen Vivienne Dorothy Moore Start | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Barnes | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Bethany Jane Rugen | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Kathleen Adela Demjaha | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Cameron Boyle | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Andrew Kingston | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.01k | £64.13k | £79.37k | £60.66k | £72.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.97k | £66.40k | £55.55k | £77.70k | £79.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.00k | £3.88k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
I. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, ESPECIALLY IN MANCHESTER ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND PEOPLE SEEKING ASYLUM OR SANCTUARY. II. TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND WELLBEING IN MANCHESTER AMONGST REFUGEES, PEOPLE SEEKING SANCTUARY, AND PEOPLE REFUSED ASYLUM IN THE UK. III. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES. IV. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING TO THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF IT FOR THEIR BENEFIT INCLUDING REFUGEES, PEOPLE SEEKING SANCTUARY, AND PEOPLE REFUSED ASYLUM IN THE UK. V. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING AND ENGAGEMENT BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o MACC
Swan Buildings
20 Swan Street
Manchester
M5 5JW
- Phone:
- 07546575195
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window