Trustees MANCHESTER CITY OF SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1168839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Naveeda Ikram Trustee 13 February 2025
GREATER MANCHESTER IMMIGRATION AID UNIT
Received: On time
Helen Vivienne Dorothy Moore Start Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
Rebecca Barnes Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
Bethany Jane Rugen Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
Kathleen Adela Demjaha Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
Cameron Boyle Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Sami Gichki Trustee 15 May 2024
YOUTH FOCUS NORTH WEST LTD
Received: On time
YOUNG ROOTS
Received: On time
THE SHEILA MCKECHNIE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr Jonathan Gilmore Trustee 06 April 2021
None on record
Mark Andrew Kingston Trustee 15 February 2021
None on record