Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BRENT MUSIC SERVICE

Charity number: 1171792
Charity reporting is overdue by 1096 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Annual return not yet received
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 365 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 365 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 731 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 731 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1096 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1096 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 06 April 2022 341 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 06 April 2022 341 days late Download Open in new window