Financial history LIGHTHOUSE CENTRAL

Charity Number: 1169839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £71.78k £48.39k £36.12k £42.12k £34.53k
Total expenditure £65.35k £52.56k £34.18k £48.08k £34.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A