YORKSHIRE ASSOCIATION OF CHANGE RINGERS BELL REPAIR FUND

Charity number: 508480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objective of the Bell Repair Fund is to advance the Christian religion by providing financial assistance to churches within the defined area for the purpose of maintaining and improving their bell installations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £12,290
Total expenditure: £3,306

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 February 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Andrew John Slade Professor Chair 11 May 2024
THE LOUGHBOROUGH BELLFOUNDRY TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days
THE ASSOCIATION OF RINGING TEACHERS: A.R.T
Received: On time
Simon John Burren Trustee 11 May 2019
None on record
Simon Plows Trustee 03 March 2018
None on record
Simon Reading Trustee 04 March 2017
None on record
Emma Coles Trustee 04 March 2017
None on record
Helen Pells Trustee 05 March 2016
None on record
DEBORAH THORLEY Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES SILSDEN
Received: On time
DAVID JOHN SPAUL Trustee
None on record
Robert Cater Trustee
None on record
PETER MCCOY Trustee
None on record
C BARRIE DOVE Trustee
None on record
PETER C KIRBY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £10.99k £9.03k £13.92k £10.94k £12.29k
Total expenditure £3.55k £1.05k £7.19k £6.61k £3.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 27 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 STONEYBROOK CLOSE
BRETTON
WAKEFIELD
WF4 4TP
Phone:
01924830423
Email:
No information available