THE SAND HOUSE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sand House Charity carries out educational activities in the fields of heritage, culture and the arts, which are linked to the former Victorian Sand House of Doncaster. Examples include illustrated talks, guided walks, exhibitions, school visits, sand sculpture training and displays, a theatre play and pop-up sand art sessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD NIGEL BELL | Chair | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Pratt | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Elizabeth Charlton | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark James Waterhouse | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew George Isaacs | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Jenkinson | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.16k | £1.34k | £5.09k | £8.16k | £1.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.82k | £4.16k | £1.39k | £5.30k | £3.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HISTORY, ART, SCULPTURE AND OTHER RELATED SUBJECTS HAVING A LINK TO THE FORMER VICTORIAN SAND HOUSE OF DONCASTER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 AYOTS GREEN
DUNSCROFT
DONCASTER
DN7 4HG
- Phone:
- 07777688438
- Email:
- info@thesandhouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window