Trustees FRIENDS OF WOOL LIBRARY
Charity number: 1173556

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Fletcher | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Frank Dennis Snart | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Anne Cottam | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Price | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Maria Chilvers | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Adams | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Kerr | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Kingman | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.