THE ORATORY OF ST. PHILIP NERI AT CARDIFF

Charity number: 1170563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Oratory of St. Philip Neri is a religious order of Roman Catholic men who living a life on common are dedicated to education, social welfare and pastoral care of young people, families and the elderly. The Oratory of St. Philip was founded five hundred years ago. The oratory in Cardiff is a new foundation living and working under the authority of the Archbishop of Cardiff.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cardiff

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 December 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE CARDIFF ORATORY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Sebastian Jones Chair 29 April 2016
GLAMORGAN HISTORY SOCIETY/CYMDEITHAS HANES MORGANNWG
Received: On time
SPLOTT COMMUNITY VOLUNTEERS
Received: On time
COMMUNITY CARE AND WELLBEING SERVICE(CCAWS)
Received: On time
Bro Illtyd Williams Trustee 26 February 2024
None on record
Simon Care Trustee 19 January 2023
None on record
Rev Alexander Gee Trustee 16 July 2020
None on record
Dr David Woolf Trustee 14 September 2016
None on record
THE VERY REVEREND IGNATIUS HARRISON Trustee 29 April 2016
THE ORATORY OF ST PHILIP NERI AT BIRMINGHAM
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF SAINT JOHN HENRY NEWMAN
Recently registered
Rev ANTON GUZIEL Trustee 29 April 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £134.13k £104.35k £92.76k £130.69k £572.44k
Total expenditure £121.64k £67.34k £78.40k £172.52k £138.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £567.35k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.47k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.63k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £450.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £138.23k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £509.81k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.30k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 17 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 17 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 11 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 13 May 2023 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 13 May 2023 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 12 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 12 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Albans Presbytery
Cameron Street
CARDIFF
CF24 2NX
Phone:
02920228738