BSR WELFARE ORGANISATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Training for Job seekers of BSR service users in london. Building low cost housing for BSR operational area in Bangladesh.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 20 April 2017: CIO registration
- BAHARMORDAN, SHOMPASHI, & RONGDASH WELFARE ORGANISATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FARUK AHMED | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KHAIRUL MIAH | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MUTHIR KHAN | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL GOFFAR | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
HARUNAR RASHID | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|||||
DELWAR AHMED TRESURER | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bulbul Ahmed | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.01k | £9.96k | £9.99k | £8.13k | £7.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.92k | £8.70k | £8.47k | £8.53k | £6.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 February 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 February 2022 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHO SPEAKS BENGALI AS FIRST LANGUAGE, LIVING IN GREATER LONDON, OR BSR GEOGRAPHICAL AREA IN BANGLADESH WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED DUE TO UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; AGE; GENDER; POOR EDUCATION OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT. B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE PEOPLE OF BSR GEOGRAPHICAL AREA AND ITS NEIGHBOURING VILLAGES IN BANGLADESH, IN THE FORM OF MONEY(OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID.
Contact information
- Address:
-
106 HIGH STREET
NORTHWOOD
HA6 1BJ
- Phone:
- 07405961224
- Email:
- Bsr.org.uk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window