BIKE TO THE FUTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cycle promotion, personal growth and skill build based on cycle maintenance training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Powys
Governance
- 25 October 2016: CIO registration
- 24 June 2022: Funds received from 1106188 SOUTH MONTGOMERYSHIRE VOLUNTEER BUREAU LIMITED
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
philip raynor | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY THORP | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2019 | 30/12/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.65k | £58.35k | £94.33k | £64.50k | £44.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.77k | £30.65k | £84.79k | £56.51k | £47.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £9.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.77k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2019 | 03 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2019 | 03 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Oct 2016 as amended on 12 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN NORTH POWYS IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING PROMOTION OF WELLBEING AND ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORTED ENGAGEMENT WITHIN A COMMUNITY BICYCLE WORKSHOP TO IMPROVE THEIR EMPLOYABILITY AND THE PROVISION OF A POOL OF BIKES FOR JOB SEEKERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Mill Fields
Milford
Newtown
SY16 3JP
- Phone:
- 07720218499
- Email:
- admin@bikettf.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window