AFRICAN FRENCH SPEAKING COMMUNITY SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children and Young People's activities: Supplementary education, Homework Club, Sports, Recreational activities Adults and families' activities: Employability, Befriending, Sport, Entertainment, Outreach, holiday schemes Networking and Public Events in the community International Development: supporting projects in some third world countries Income generation to be reinvested in the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Angola
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Central African Republic
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Gabon
- Guinea
- Ivory Coast
- Mali
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- Togo
- Uganda
Governance
- 20 September 2016: Standard registration
- 23 September 2016: Funds received from 1145893 AFRICAN FRENCH SPEAKING COMMUNITY SUPPORT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacques Matensi-kubanza | Chair | 22 December 2010 |
|
|||||
Ian Sibanda | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Petelo Gally Sakwanga | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simplice Odette Nkonge-mbomba | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JASON NDUNDULA BSC HONS | Trustee | 22 December 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.00k | £226.47k | £171.00k | £199.47k | £180.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.17k | £110.03k | £111.70k | £155.08k | £144.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
OBJECTS THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN PEOPLE OF AFRICAN ETHNIC ORIGIN WHOSE FIRST LANGUAGE IS FRENCH AND WHO ARE RESIDING IN AFRICA OR IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF SUFFICIENT. THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES OF FRENCH SPEAKING AFRICA SO THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE WHO LIVE IN FRENCH SPEAKING AFRICAN COUNTRIES, OR WHO HAVE BEEN DISPLACED FROM FRENCH SPEAKING AREAS OF AFRICA BY NATURAL DISASTER OR CATASTROPHE BY THE SUPPLY AID TO SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Phillips Parish Centre
Watt Street
SMETHWICK
West Midlands
B66 3DA
- Phone:
- 01216793354
- Email:
- enquiries@afscs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window