Accounts and annual returns WALLASEY CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 508692
Charity reporting is overdue by 1734 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 273 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 273 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 639 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 639 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1004 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1004 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1369 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1369 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1734 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1734 days