Financial history CRADLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 508710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £22.33k £23.44k £11.26k £17.18k £12.33k
Total expenditure £11.97k £9.14k £14.72k £15.91k £18.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.63k £21.31k £3.49k £3.50k £3.48k