THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT WALTHAM WITH FORD END

Charity number: 1171387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The role of the Parochial Church Council (PCC) is to oversee the running of the activities of the ministry and the churches in the Parish of Great Waltham with Ford End. This includes att matters related to church services, the maintenance and improvement of the churches and churchyards and delivering the ministry in the wider community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £79,176
Total expenditure: £85,881

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 January 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GREAT WALTHAM WITH FORD END PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Daniel Charles Pierce Chair 24 November 2022
ST FRANCIS’ COMMUNITY CHURCH
Received: On time
FORMISSION CIO
Received: On time
GREAT WALTHAM SCHOOL HOUSE TRUST
Recently registered
Pauline Anne Briggs Trustee 02 April 2023
None on record
Kerri Donna Wiffin Trustee 02 April 2023
None on record
David Scully Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Dr Hywel Jones Trustee 08 May 2022
THE CHELMSFORD MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH TRUST
Received: On time
SARAH JANE THRELFALL Trustee 08 May 2022
STOW MARIES GREAT WAR AERODROME LTD
Received: On time
David Edward Williams Trustee 18 October 2020
GREAT WALTHAM SCHOOL HOUSE TRUST
Recently registered
Joanne Rebecca Pritchard Trustee 18 October 2020
GREAT WALTHAM SCHOOL HOUSE TRUST
Recently registered
Sheila Yardley Bearman Trustee 24 September 2019
GREAT WALTHAM SCHOOL HOUSE TRUST
Recently registered
David John Tyler Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Roger David Bearman Trustee 29 April 2017
None on record
HELEN VIRGINIA POWELL Trustee 01 April 2009
GREAT WALTHAM SCHOOL HOUSE TRUST
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £75.90k £57.46k £60.03k £72.42k £79.18k
Total expenditure £91.18k £57.29k £55.49k £69.51k £85.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 05 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 March 2022 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 March 2022 144 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Fairway Drive
CHELMSFORD
CM3 3FH
Phone:
07957 228467